MO HCR32 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to support the development of a rare earth element refinery and create a Thorium Bank
Title
Urges the U.S. Congress to support the development of a rare earth element refinery and create a Thorium Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2013-03-27 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR32&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HCR0032I.htm |