MO HB880 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the boards and commissions within the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Changes the laws regarding the boards and commissions within the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-23 | House | Executive Session - No Action Taken |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred: Agri-Business(H) |
2013-03-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |