MO HB869 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Steamboat Legacy Fund."
Title
Creates the "Steamboat Legacy Fund."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB869&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1787H.01I.pdf |