MO HB805 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the state lottery from publishing the names of lottery winners without consent
Title
Prohibits the state lottery from publishing the names of lottery winners without consent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2013-03-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB805&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0805I.htm |