MO HB801 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rosa Parks Observance Day Commission within the Governor's Office to organize and coordinate activities and events to celebrate her life and raise awareness of her legacy
Title
Establishes the Rosa Parks Observance Day Commission within the Governor's Office to organize and coordinate activities and events to celebrate her life and raise awareness of her legacy
Sponsors
Rep. Clem Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Trade and Tourism(H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB801&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0801I.PDF |