MO HB743 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires trauma-informed schools to keep incident records and provide notice of certain incidents
Title
Requires trauma-informed schools to keep incident records and provide notice of certain incidents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |