MO HB719 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding actions against insurers
Title
Changes the laws regarding actions against insurers
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB719&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0719I.PDF |