MO HB692 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for retail electric service providers
Title
Modifies provisions for retail electric service providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |