MO HB673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Cronkite New Voices Act."
Title
Establishes the "Cronkite New Voices Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB673&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1555H.01I.pdf |