MO HB590 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person to engage in the practice of specified professions without being licensed if he or she does not hold himself or herself out as being licensed
Title
Authorizes a person to engage in the practice of specified professions without being licensed if he or she does not hold himself or herself out as being licensed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB590&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0590I.htm |