MO HB586 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Guarantees the right to conduct and participate in rodeos in this state and prohibits a restriction on the conducting of or participation in rodeos
Title
Guarantees the right to conduct and participate in rodeos in this state and prohibits a restriction on the conducting of or participation in rodeos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |