MO HB577 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school districts to display "In God We Trust" in prominent locations in all schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to display "In God We Trust" in prominent locations in all schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-04-18HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2019-01-16HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback