MO HB574 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri
Title
Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Haden [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: HB 574 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 102 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: HB 574 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: HB 574 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: HB 574 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: HB 574 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-10 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 101 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 102 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 1 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended, SA 3 AYES: 23 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 29, 2021, 2:30 p.m., SCR 2 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 2 |
2021-02-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-22 | House | Prefiled (H) |