MO HB527 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health benefit plan open enrollment periods
Title
Changes the laws regarding health benefit plan open enrollment periods
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - HB 527 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1, AMENDED 2. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions(S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Insurance(H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |