MO HB523 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age or older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle if they have the appropriate health insurance coverage
Title
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age or older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle if they have the appropriate health insurance coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - HB 523 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - HB 523 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - HB 523 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 22, 2015, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 97 NOES: 57 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |