MO HB499 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to records of regularly conducted activity as evidence law
Title
Modifies provisions relating to records of regularly conducted activity as evidence law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |