MO HB479 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts data collected by state agencies under the federal Animal Disease Traceability Program from disclosure under Missouri's Sunshine Law
Title
Exempts data collected by state agencies under the federal Animal Disease Traceability Program from disclosure under Missouri's Sunshine Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 479 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - HB 479 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - HB 479 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |