MO HB47 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that all individuals shall be guaranteed the freedom to work without being required to join or pay dues to any labor organization
Title
Specifies that all individuals shall be guaranteed the freedom to work without being required to join or pay dues to any labor organization
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Lant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB47&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0047I.PDF |