MO HB47 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, prior to any person younger than 17 years of age using a tanning device in a tanning facility, the parent or guardian of the person to appear in person giving written consent to the minor's use of a device
Title
Requires, prior to any person younger than 17 years of age using a tanning device in a tanning facility, the parent or guardian of the person to appear in person giving written consent to the minor's use of a device
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, 1:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 47 |
2013-04-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |