MO HB450 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the first Friday in May each year as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day"
Title
Designates the first Friday in May each year as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day"
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |