MO HB450 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits anyone from sending, reading, or writing a text message while operating a motor vehicle
Title
Prohibits anyone from sending, reading, or writing a text message while operating a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2015-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB450&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0450I.PDF |