MO HB439 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to issue school district teaching permits for persons without a certificate of license to teach granted by the state board of education
Title
Allows school districts to issue school district teaching permits for persons without a certificate of license to teach granted by the state board of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: HB 439 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Taken Up |
2021-04-14 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |