MO HB354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that parental liberty to direct the upbringing, education, and care of his or her children is a fundamental right not subject to infringement without demonstrating a compelling governmental interest
Title
Specifies that parental liberty to direct the upbringing, education, and care of his or her children is a fundamental right not subject to infringement without demonstrating a compelling governmental interest
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |