MO HB325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to the legalization of marijuana for adult use
Title
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to the legalization of marijuana for adult use
Sponsors
Rep. Wiley Price [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |