MO HB2845 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the SALT Parity Act
Title
Establishes the SALT Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |