MO HB2760 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to insurance coverage for diagnostic examinations for breast cancer
Title
Creates provisions relating to insurance coverage for diagnostic examinations for breast cancer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred: Insurance(H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |