MO HB2468 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to trial procedures for murder in the first degree
Title
Modifies provisions relating to trial procedures for murder in the first degree
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Re-referred to Committee: General Laws(H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |