MO HB2363 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of illegal reentry
Title
Creates the offense of illegal reentry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2363&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2363I.PDF |