MO HB2312 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all electric and gas utilities to report annually the percentage of energy efficiency incentives used by low-income customers to the Division of Energy
Title
Requires all electric and gas utilities to report annually the percentage of energy efficiency incentives used by low-income customers to the Division of Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Energy and the Environment(H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2312&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2312I.PDF |