MO HB2291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agri-business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agri-business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Animal Care Advisory Committee to review and make recommendations on the welfare of poultry, livestock, and licensed dog breeding facilities in this state
Title
Establishes the Missouri Animal Care Advisory Committee to review and make recommendations on the welfare of poultry, livestock, and licensed dog breeding facilities in this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-04-01 | Referred: Agri-Business (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2291&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2291I.htm |