MO HB2290 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding child care assistance
Title
Changes the laws regarding child care assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-09 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 8 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 133 NOES: 7 | |
2010-05-13 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2010-05-13 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Refer: Spec Stand Com on Pro. Registration & Licensing (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |