MO HB2252 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reauthorizes the provisions regarding the tax credit for contributions to pregnancy resource centers and extends the expiration date until August 28, 2022
Title
Reauthorizes the provisions regarding the tax credit for contributions to pregnancy resource centers and extends the expiration date until August 28, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Faith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Second Rd/Refer: Government Accountability &Fisc Oversght(S) | |
2010-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-22 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-12 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |