MO HB2232 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Safe Schools Act
Title
Establishes the Safe Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2232&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6060H.01I.pdf |