MO HB2168 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding local sales taxes so that no political subdivision may raise the rates above twelve percent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding local sales taxes so that no political subdivision may raise the rates above twelve percent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-26HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-03-26HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-03-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-28HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2018-01-18HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback