MO HB2153 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elections and establishes the Election Consolidation Act of 2010
Title
Changes the laws regarding elections and establishes the Election Consolidation Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Deeken [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2153&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2153I.htm |