MO HB2098 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provision regulating capitol parking garages.
Title
Modifies provision regulating capitol parking garages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Administration and Accounts(H) |
2020-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |