MO HB2098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals statutory provisions relating to the Missouri Children's Services Commission
Title
Repeals statutory provisions relating to the Missouri Children's Services Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee to Improve the Care and Well-being of Young People(H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2098&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4042H.03I.pdf |