MO HB2075 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that abandoned property reports required to be signed by law enforcement must be signed by a law enforcement officer with jurisdiction over the location form which the abandoned property was towed
Title
Specifies that abandoned property reports required to be signed by law enforcement must be signed by a law enforcement officer with jurisdiction over the location form which the abandoned property was towed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 and HCA 2 AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2075&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2075I.PDF |