MO HB2043 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a person applying for an original certificate of ownership for an all-terrain or off-highway vehicle to submit an affidavit explaining how it was acquired and a copy of the bill of sale
Title
Requires a person applying for an original certificate of ownership for an all-terrain or off-highway vehicle to submit an affidavit explaining how it was acquired and a copy of the bill of sale
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 1 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-17 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |