MO HB2042 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from discriminating in providing compensation based on gender for the same work
Title
Prohibits employers from discriminating in providing compensation based on gender for the same work
Sponsors
Rep. Trish Gunby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |