MO HB1995 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for protections for parental rights and transparency in public schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for protections for parental rights and transparency in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2022-02-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
2022-02-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2022-02-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-02-08HouseAction Postponed (H)
2022-02-08HouseExecutive Session Continued
2022-01-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2022-01-06HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2022-01-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2022-01-05HouseRead First Time (H)
2021-12-16HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback