MO HB1980 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students
Title
Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |