MO HB1893 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the distribution of gaming funds for early childhood education and veterans' programs and requires an annual audit to be conducted on the fund accounts for three years
Title
Changes the laws regarding the distribution of gaming funds for early childhood education and veterans' programs and requires an annual audit to be conducted on the fund accounts for three years
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SS#2 ADOPTED AYES: 153 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-12 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS#2 | |
2010-05-12 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 1 | |
2010-05-12 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) - SS#2 | |
2010-05-12 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2010-05-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED/SS, SA 2 PENDING | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (S) - SCA 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS WITH SCA 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY,APRIL 20, 2010, 1:30P.M.,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2010-03-30 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |