MO HB1886 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the earnings tax in the cities of Kansas City and St. Louis on December 31, 2019
Title
Repeals the earnings tax in the cities of Kansas City and St. Louis on December 31, 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1886&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1886I.PDF |