MO HB1825 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a fire truck to be used for specified patient transport under certain conditions
Title
Allows a fire truck to be used for specified patient transport under certain conditions
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1825&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1825I.htm |