MO HB1778 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Third Read and Defeated (S) - YEAS: 17 NAYS: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Third Read and Defeated (S) - YEAS: 17 NAYS: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating September 14 as "Organ Donor Awareness Day"
Title
Requires the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating September 14 as "Organ Donor Awareness Day"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Third Read and Defeated (S) - YEAS: 17 NAYS: 16 | |
2010-04-14 | SCS Defeated (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED | |
2010-04-08 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-08 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 8, 2010, 9:00A.M.,SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Progress and Development (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Tourism (H) | |
2010-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |