MO HB1705 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Returned to Committee of Origin (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Returned to Committee of Origin (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an alternate procedure for issuing bonds for a common sewer subdistrict in Cass County
Title
Authorizes an alternate procedure for issuing bonds for a common sewer subdistrict in Cass County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Rural Community Development (H) | |
2010-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |