MO HB1680 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public institutions of higher education from requiring students to live on campus, except for first-year freshmen who may be required to live in campus housing for their first year
Title
Prohibits public institutions of higher education from requiring students to live on campus, except for first-year freshmen who may be required to live in campus housing for their first year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1680&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4323H.01I.pdf |