MO HB167 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the statute of limitation for certain actions to recover damages regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child and allows prosecutions for child abuse to be commenced at any time
Title
Removes the statute of limitation for certain actions to recover damages regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child and allows prosecutions for child abuse to be commenced at any time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB167&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0167I.PDF |