MO HB1655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to official documents.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to official documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1655 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1655 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: HB 1655 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1655 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: HB 1655 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-06 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-27 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2020-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-15 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 143 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-15 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-04 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Fiscal Oversight pending referral - Thursday, April 30, 2020, 9:30 AM, Joint Committee Room |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 am, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |